This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/14/2021 at 00:09:59 (UTC).

Nevada Irrigation District vs. California State Water Resources Control Board

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 Nevada Irrigation District filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against California State Water Resources Control Board. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3544

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nevada Irrigation District

Respondents

Eileen Sobeck, in her official capacity

California State Water Resources Control Board

E. Joaquin Esquivel, in his official capacity

Dorene D'Adamo, in her official capacity

Sean Maguire, in his official capacity

Laurel Firestone, in her official capacity

Does 1-100

Tam M. Doduc, in her official capacity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Andrew J McClure

Respondent Attorney

Adam L Levitan

 

Court Documents

Notice - Other (of CEQA Settlement Meeting) filed.

Notice - Other (of CEQA Settlement Meeting) filed. (Filed By: California State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent); Dorene D'Adamo, in her official capacity(Respondent); E. Joaquin Esquivel, in his official capacity(Respondent); Eileen Sobeck, in her official capacity(Respondent); Laurel Firestone, in her official capacity(Respondent); Sean Maguire, in his official capacity(Respondent); Tam M. Doduc, in her official capacity(Respondent))

Notice - Other (of CEQA Hearing) filed.

Notice - Other (of CEQA Hearing) filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Regarding Deadline for Response to Petition) filed.

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Regarding Deadline for Response to Petition) filed. (Filed By: California State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent); Dorene D'Adamo, in her official capacity(Respondent); E. Joaquin Esquivel, in his official capacity(Respondent); Eileen Sobeck, in her official capacity(Respondent); Laurel Firestone, in her official capacity(Respondent); Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner); Sean Maguire, in his official capacity(Respondent); Tam M. Doduc, in her official capacity(Respondent))

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Regarding Deadline For Response to Petition) filed.

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Regarding Deadline For Response to Petition) filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Request - Other (for CEQA Hearing) filed.

Request - Other (for CEQA Hearing) filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Notice - Other (to Attorney General of the State of California of Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed.

Notice - Other (to Attorney General of the State of California of Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Notice - Other (of Election to Prepare Record of Proceedings) filed.

Notice - Other (of Election to Prepare Record of Proceedings) filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

Case initiation form printed .

Case initiation form printed .

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate; Department: 23; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Stipulation and Order Regarding Deadline For Response to Petition) filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketMotion - Other - Writ of Mandate scheduled for 04/23/2021 at 11:00:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Regarding Deadline for Response to Petition) filed. (Filed By: California State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent); Dorene D'Adamo, in her official capacity(Respondent); E. Joaquin Esquivel, in his official capacity(Respondent); Eileen Sobeck, in her official capacity(Respondent); Laurel Firestone, in her official capacity(Respondent); Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner); Sean Maguire, in his official capacity(Respondent); Tam M. Doduc, in her official capacity(Respondent))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of CEQA Hearing) filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of CEQA Settlement Meeting) filed. (Filed By: California State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent); Dorene D'Adamo, in her official capacity(Respondent); E. Joaquin Esquivel, in his official capacity(Respondent); Eileen Sobeck, in her official capacity(Respondent); Laurel Firestone, in her official capacity(Respondent); Sean Maguire, in his official capacity(Respondent); Tam M. Doduc, in her official capacity(Respondent))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Other (for CEQA Hearing) filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (to Attorney General of the State of California of Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Election to Prepare Record of Proceedings) filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Nevada Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 23 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nevada Irrigation District is a litigant