This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/06/2023 at 17:09:02 (UTC).

Neutra Builders, Inc. vs. Corestates Construction Services, Inc., a Georgia Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Neutra Builders, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Corestates Construction Services, Inc , a Georgia Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4097

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neutra Builders, Inc.

Defendants

Corestates Construction Services, Inc., a Georgia Corporation

Does 1-100

North American Specialty Insurance Company, a New Hampshire corporation

The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California, a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew C Carlton

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Re: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Re: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Neutra Builders, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Neutra Builders, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Neutra Builders, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Notice - Other (of Recording Notice of Pendency of Action) filed

Notice - Other (of Recording Notice of Pendency of Action) filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Notice - Other (Release of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)) filed

Notice - Other (Release of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (Release of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)) filed; Filed By: Neutra Builders, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal filed; Filed By: Neutra Builders, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (of Recording Notice of Pendency of Action) filed; Filed By: Neutra Builders, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 01/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Neutra Builders, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Re: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Neutra Builders, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Neutra Builders, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Corestates Construction Services, Inc., a Georgia Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant