This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 11:35:49 (UTC).

Naomi Goudeaux vs. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 Naomi Goudeaux filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3776

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Goudeaux, Naomi

Goudeaux, Phillip

Defendants

Does 1-10

Ford Motor Company

Future Ford of Sacramento

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tionna Dolin

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Goudeaux, Naomi(Plaintiff); Goudeaux, Phillip(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Goudeaux, Naomi(Plaintiff); Goudeaux, Phillip(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Goudeaux, Naomi(Plaintiff); Goudeaux, Phillip(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Goudeaux, Naomi(Plaintiff); Goudeaux, Phillip(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Goudeaux, Naomi(Plaintiff); Goudeaux, Phillip(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less