This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/24/2020 at 19:54:36 (UTC).

Mona Younis vs. Salvation Army

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Mona Younis filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Salvation Army. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7990

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Younis, Mona

Defendants

Salvation Army

Does 1 - 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert P Biegler

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Younis, Mona(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Younis, Mona(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Younis, Mona(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Younis, Mona(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Younis, Mona(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Younis, Mona(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less