This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 21:08:26 (UTC).

MNK Logistics LLC vs. Cedar Freight LLC

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 MNK Logistics LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cedar Freight LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0562

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MNK Logistics LLC

Defendants

Off Road Innovations of Richmond Inc

Cedar Freight LLC

Does 1-20

Rubicon Expedition Products LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

harutiun Kassakhian

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: MNK Logistics LLC(Plaintiff))

Declaration of Non Service filed.

Declaration of Non Service filed. (Filed By: MNK Logistics LLC(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: MNK Logistics LLC(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: MNK Logistics LLC(Plaintiff))

Declaration of Non Service filed.

Declaration of Non Service filed. (Filed By: MNK Logistics LLC(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service filed. (Filed By: MNK Logistics LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: MNK Logistics LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: MNK Logistics LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service filed. (Filed By: MNK Logistics LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: MNK Logistics LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: MNK Logistics LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: MNK Logistics LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASSAKHIAN HARUTIUN