This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/22/2023 at 01:01:17 (UTC).

Miracle Heaven Clark vs. Sonrise at 50, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Miracle Heaven Clark filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Sonrise at 50, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7819

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Clark, Miracle Heaven

Defendants

Does 1 - 20

Sonrise at 50, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica L Campbell

Defendant Attorneys

Giulio A Sanchez

Michael S Helsley

 

Court Documents

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 04/20/2023 01:30:00 PM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 04/20/2023 01:30:00 PM

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 04/20/2023 01:30:00 PM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 04/20/2023 01:30:00 PM published

Joint Case Management Statement filed

Joint Case Management Statement filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 03/23/2023 09:54:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 03/23/2023 09:54:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 12/15/2022 01:30:00 PM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 12/15/2022 01:30:00 PM

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 12/15/2022 01:30:00 PM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 12/15/2022 01:30:00 PM published

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Joint Case Management Statement filed

Joint Case Management Statement filed

Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed

Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Amended Complaint (First) filed

Amended Complaint (First) filed

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Orders RE: Complex Case Management Procedures) filed

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Orders RE: Complex Case Management Procedures) filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 27; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 27; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 04/20/2023 01:30:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: The Case Management Conference - Complex is scheduled for 08/24/2023 at 01:30 PM in Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 08/24/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 27 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 04/20/2023 01:30:00 PM published

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Joint Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: Clark, Miracle(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 9:54 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 27; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 03/23/2023 09:54:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Orders RE: Complex Case Management Procedures) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 25 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Clark, Miracle(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case reassigned to 25 effective 04/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Clark, Miracle(Plaintiff); and on behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Designated a complex action on 04/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Clark, Miracle(Plaintiff); and on behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Clark, Miracle(Plaintiff); and on behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less