This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/12/2019 at 13:01:42 (UTC).

Michael Christiansen vs. California Delta Mechanical Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Michael Christiansen filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against California Delta Mechanical Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9472

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kimbriel, Breanden

Christiansen, Michael

On behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

Defendants

Does 1-10

California Delta Mechanical Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary R Basham

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Christiansen, Michael(Plaintiff); Kimbriel, Breanden(Plaintiff); On behalf of himself and all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Christiansen, Michael(Plaintiff); Kimbriel, Breanden(Plaintiff); On behalf of himself and all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Christiansen, Michael(Plaintiff); Kimbriel, Breanden(Plaintiff); On behalf of himself and all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to 31 effective 11/25/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 47 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDesignated a complex action on 11/21/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Christiansen, Michael(Plaintiff); Kimbriel, Breanden(Plaintiff); On behalf of himself and all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Christiansen, Michael(Plaintiff); Kimbriel, Breanden(Plaintiff); On behalf of himself and all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Christiansen, Michael(Plaintiff); Kimbriel, Breanden(Plaintiff); On behalf of himself and all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less