This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/19/2022 at 01:19:03 (UTC).

MGP XI University Village, LLC vs. CDSR Corp.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 MGP XI University Village, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against CDSR Corp. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0108

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MGP XI University Village, LLC

Defendants

CDSR Corp.

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen C Duringer

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: MGP XI University Village, LLC(Plaintiff))

Supplemental - Other (man) filed.

Supplemental - Other (man) filed. (Filed By: MGP XI University Village, LLC(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: MGP XI University Village, LLC(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: MGP XI University Village, LLC(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: MGP XI University Village, LLC(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal filed; Filed By: MGP XI University Village, LLC(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: MGP XI University Village, LLC(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 5-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Supplemental - Other (man) filed; Filed By: MGP XI University Village, LLC(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: MGP XI University Village, LLC(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: MGP XI University Village, LLC(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DURINGER STEPHEN C.