This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/19/2023 at 01:00:51 (UTC).

Meisy Perez Gonzalez vs. Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 Meisy Perez Gonzalez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5017

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gonzalez, Meisy Perez

Defendants

Does 1-50

Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., A Nevada Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan S Cadry

Defendant Attorney

Michael S Helsley

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Request - Entry of Default filed

Request - Entry of Default filed

Answer submitted by Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., A Nevada Corporation rejected on 12/13/2022

Answer submitted by Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., A Nevada Corporation rejected on 12/13/2022

Stipulation (to Set Aside Default) filed

Stipulation (to Set Aside Default) filed

Answer submitted by Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., A Nevada Corporation rejected on 01/10/2023

Answer submitted by Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., A Nevada Corporation rejected on 01/10/2023

Proposed Order (Granting Withdrawal of Request for Default) filed

Proposed Order (Granting Withdrawal of Request for Default) filed

Order - Other (Order GRANTING Stipulation to Set Aside Default) filed

Order - Other (Order GRANTING Stipulation to Set Aside Default) filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed; Filed By: Gonzalez, Meisy(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., a Nevada Corporation(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Default vacated as to Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., a Nevada Corporation on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Order GRANTING Stipulation to Set Aside Default) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proposed Order (Granting Withdrawal of Request for Default) filed; Filed By: Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., a Nevada Corporation(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer submitted by Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., A Nevada Corporation rejected on 01/10/2023; Filed By: Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., a Nevada Corporation(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Helsley, Michael S added as a effective 12/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Stipulation (to Set Aside Default) filed; Filed By: Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., a Nevada Corporation(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer submitted by Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., A Nevada Corporation rejected on 12/13/2022; Filed By: Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., a Nevada Corporation(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Default entered as to Marathon Staffing Solutions Inc., A Nevada Corporation on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request - Entry of Default filed; Filed By: Gonzalez, Meisy(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Gonzalez, Meisy(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Gonzalez, Meisy(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Gonzalez, Meisy(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Gonzalez, Meisy(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less