This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/24/2019 at 13:40:06 (UTC).

Martin Brothers Construction vs. City of Elk Grove

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Martin Brothers Construction filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against City of Elk Grove. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7916

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin Brothers Construction

Defendants

Does 1-50

City of Elk Grove

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory A Meredith

Defendant Attorney

David W Tyra

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/31/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/31/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Martin Brothers Construction(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Martin Brothers Construction(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Martin Brothers Construction(Plaintiff))

Answer (to Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Defendant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Martin Brothers Construction(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Order on Stipulation and Order to Mediation) filed.

Order - Other (Order on Stipulation and Order to Mediation) filed.

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/31/2019 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/31/2019 08:30:00 AM .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/31/2019 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/31/2019 08:30:00 AM published .

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Defendant))

Stipulation and Order for Court Ordered Mediation filed.

Stipulation and Order for Court Ordered Mediation filed. (Filed By: Martin Brothers Construction(Plaintiff))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Martin Brothers Construction(Plaintiff))

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Order on Stipulation and Order to Mediation) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/31/2019 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/31/2019 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order for Court Ordered Mediation filed. (Filed By: Martin Brothers Construction(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Martin Brothers Construction(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Martin Brothers Construction(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/31/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/01/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Martin Brothers Construction(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Martin Brothers Construction(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Martin Brothers Construction(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTIN BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where City of Elk Grove is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TYRA, DAVID W