This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 11/04/2022 at 13:39:15 (UTC).

Marsha L Scribner vs. Selene Finance, L.P

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 Marsha L Scribner filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Selene Finance, L P. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6675

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scribner, Marsha L.

Defendants

Does 1-10

Selene Finance, L.P

U.S. Bank Trust National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Owner Trustee for RCF 2 Acquisition Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony Paul Cara

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Declaration - Other (Verification of Plaintiff's Complaint) filed

Declaration - Other (Verification of Plaintiff's Complaint) filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Scribner, Marsha(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Scribner, Marsha(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Scribner, Marsha(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Verification of Plaintiff's Complaint) filed; Filed By: Scribner, Marsha(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Scribner, Marsha(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Scribner, Marsha(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELENE FINANCE, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA ANTHONY P.