This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 13:05:15 (UTC).

Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company vs. Preferred Doc Solutions LP

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Preferred Doc Solutions LP. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3673

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company

Defendants

Does 1-10

Preferred Doc Solutions LP

Delgado, Lizbeth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Josiah M Prendergast

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/03/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/03/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/03/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 04/03/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Marksys Holdings LLC a Delaware limited liability company(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRENDERGAST JOSIAH M