This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/15/2022 at 00:06:19 (UTC).

Marilyn Ramsey vs. Joanna Graf

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Marilyn Ramsey filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Joanna Graf. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5498

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ramsey, Marilyn

Ramsey, William

Defendants

Does 1-10

Graf, Joanna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph R Yates

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Ramsey, Marilyn(Plaintiff); Ramsey, William(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Ramsey, Marilyn(Plaintiff); Ramsey, William(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Ramsey, Marilyn(Plaintiff); Ramsey, William(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Ramsey, Marilyn(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Ramsey, Marilyn(Plaintiff); Ramsey, William(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal filed; Filed By: Ramsey, Marilyn(Plaintiff); Ramsey, William(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Ramsey, Marilyn(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Ramsey, Marilyn(Plaintiff); Ramsey, William(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Ramsey, Marilyn(Plaintiff); Ramsey, William(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Ramsey, Marilyn(Plaintiff); Ramsey, William(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YATES JOSEPH RUDOLPH