This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 19:52:33 (UTC).

Maria Soledad Garcia Cuevas vs. Alfonso Garcia

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 Maria Soledad Garcia Cuevas filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Alfonso Garcia. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2031

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garcia Cuevas, Maria Soledad

Defendants

Mondelez International, Inc. A Delaware Corporation

Does 1-25

Garcia, Alfonso

Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neama Rahmani

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (re:Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re:Initial CMC) filed.

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Demand for Jury Trial filed.

Demand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re:Initial CMC) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/22/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Garcia Cuevas, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAHMANI, NEAMA