This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 03:06:08 (UTC).

Maria Naveja vs. Primerica Inc a Delaware corporation

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 Maria Naveja filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Primerica Inc a Delaware corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8651

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Naveja, Maria

On behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated

Defendants

Primerica Client Services Inc a Delware corporation

Primerica Inc a Delaware corporation

Primerica Financial Services a Nevada limited liability company

Does 1-100

Primerica Life Insurance Company a Tennessee corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas Han

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff))

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed. (Filed By: Primerica Client Services Inc a Delware corporation(Defendant); Primerica Financial Services a Nevada limited liability company(Defendant); Primerica Inc a Delaware corporation(Defendant); Primerica Life Insurance Company a Tennessee corporation(Defendant))

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff); On behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff); On behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff); On behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDesignated a complex action on 07/29/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to 40 effective 07/29/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed. (Filed By: Primerica Client Services Inc a Delware corporation(Defendant); Primerica Financial Services a Nevada limited liability company(Defendant); Primerica Inc a Delaware corporation(Defendant); Primerica Life Insurance Company a Tennessee corporation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff); On behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff); On behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Naveja, Maria(Plaintiff); On behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 47 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Primerica, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Primerica Financial Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where on behalf of other members of the general publlic simliarly siuated, and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act is a litigant

Latest cases where Primerica Life Insurance Company is a litigant