This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 16:32:10 (UTC).

Maria Martinez Arroyo vs. Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 Maria Martinez Arroyo filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc , a New Jersey Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7465

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arroyo, Maria Martinez

Defendants

Does 1-10

Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chad Allen David

Defendant Attorney

Sean P Conboy

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Demurrer (to Complaint) filed

Demurrer (to Complaint) filed

Declaration - Other (of Andrew Yu-Chih ISO Demurrer) filed

Declaration - Other (of Andrew Yu-Chih ISO Demurrer) filed

Proof of Service filed

Proof of Service filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 05/09/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Conboy, Sean P added as a effective 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service filed; Filed By: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Andrew Yu-Chih ISO Demurrer) filed; Filed By: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Demurrer (to Complaint) filed; Filed By: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Arroyo, Maria(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Arroyo, Maria(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Arroyo, Maria(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Arroyo, Maria(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONBOY SEAN P