This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 13:53:04 (UTC).

Maria Loza vs. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 Maria Loza filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8905

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Loza, Jorge

Loza, Maria

Defendants

Does 1-25

California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Nykodym

Defendant Attorney

Julio A Hernandez

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/14/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/14/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

Summons (on First Amended Complaint) filed.

Summons (on First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

Answer (to Amended Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(Defendant))

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/14/2019 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/14/2019 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/14/2019 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/14/2019 08:30:00 AM .

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 23; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/14/2019 08:30:00 AM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCase Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCase Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/14/2019 08:30:00 AM published .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed. (Filed By: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (to Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons (on First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/14/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 23 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/17/2018 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Loza, Jorge(Plaintiff); Loza, Maria(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less