This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 20:29:42 (UTC).

Maria Guadalupe Torres Ramos, individually and as successor in interest to Juan Luis Campos, deceased vs. Alta California Regional Center, Inc

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 Maria Guadalupe Torres Ramos, individually and as successor in interest to Juan Luis Campos, deceased filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Alta California Regional Center, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9839

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Guadalupe Torres Ramos, individually and as successor in interest to Juan Luis Campos, deceased

Defendants

Alta California Regional Center, Inc

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel B Miller

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/11/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/11/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Maria Guadalupe Torres Ramos, individually and as successor in interest to Juan Luis Campos, deceased(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Maria Guadalupe Torres Ramos, individually and as successor in interest to Juan Luis Campos, deceased(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/11/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Maria Guadalupe Torres Ramos, individually and as successor in interest to Juan Luis Campos, deceased(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Maria Guadalupe Torres Ramos, individually and as successor in interest to Juan Luis Campos, deceased(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less