This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 16:17:13 (UTC).

Maria Elana Lara vs. Carl Lester Dexter

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Maria Elana Lara filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Carl Lester Dexter. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9333

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lara, Maria Elana

Defendants

Does 1-25

Dexter, Carl Lester

Arbitrage, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eyad Yaser Abdeljawad

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Lara, Maria(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Re: Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Re: Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Lara, Maria(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Lara, Maria(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Lara, Maria(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/07/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketThis case is reassigned from department 43 to department 38 for Case Management Program.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Lara, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Lara, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Lara, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Re: Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Lara, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABDELJAWAD EYAD YASER