This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/19/2022 at 22:52:28 (UTC).

Margaret Vogele vs. Antonio Leofredo Alarcon

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 Margaret Vogele filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Antonio Leofredo Alarcon. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3204

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vogele, Margaret

Defendants

Alarcon, Antonio Leofredo

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter B Tiemann

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Vogele, Margaret(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Vogele, Margaret(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Vogele, Margaret(Plaintiff))

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination - ORDER

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination - ORDER

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Order - Other (re: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (re: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case reassigned to 31 effective 01/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (re: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Complex case designation removed effective 01/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Exceptional designation removed effective 01/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination - ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Designated a complex action on 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Vogele, Margaret(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Vogele, Margaret(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Vogele, Margaret(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tiemann, Peter B