This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 15:06:53 (UTC).

Marc Lui vs. Pacific Men's Clinic, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 Marc Lui filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Pacific Men's Clinic, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7305

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lui, Marc

Defendants

Does 1-50

Dr. Ahmid Dredar, MD

Pacific Men's Clinic, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel Rapaport

Defendant Attorney

Richard D Carroll

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/16/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/16/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Request for Dismissal - Cause(s) of Action filed

Request for Dismissal - Cause(s) of Action filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Dr. Ahmid Dredar, MD(Defendant); Pacific Men's Clinic, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal - Cause(s) of Action filed; Filed By: Lui, Marc(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Lui, Marc(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/16/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Lui, Marc(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Lui, Marc(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less