This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 05:25:17 (UTC).

Mahkenna R Washington vs. Eagle Systems Inc

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Mahkenna R Washington filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Eagle Systems Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8880

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Washington, Kobe

Washington, Mahkenna R.

Washington, Chase O.

Washington, Ashton D.

Defendants

Danishjo, Abdul Sattar

Direct Chassilink Inc

Does 1-50

Eagle Systems Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert A Buccola

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Kobe(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Chase(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Ashton(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Washington, Ashton(Plaintiff); Washington, Chase(Plaintiff); Washington, Kobe(Plaintiff); Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Washington, Ashton(Plaintiff); Washington, Chase(Plaintiff); Washington, Kobe(Plaintiff); Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Washington, Ashton(Plaintiff); Washington, Chase(Plaintiff); Washington, Kobe(Plaintiff); Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Kobe(Plaintiff))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Chase(Plaintiff))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Ashton(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Washington, Ashton(Plaintiff); Washington, Chase(Plaintiff); Washington, Kobe(Plaintiff); Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Washington, Ashton(Plaintiff); Washington, Chase(Plaintiff); Washington, Kobe(Plaintiff); Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Washington, Ashton(Plaintiff); Washington, Chase(Plaintiff); Washington, Kobe(Plaintiff); Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Ashton(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Chase(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Kobe(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Ashton(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Chase(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Mahkenna(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Washington, Kobe(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eagle Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DIRECT CHASSISLINK INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A Buccola