This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/12/2023 at 01:08:41 (UTC).

Lisa Marie Ortega vs. Michaela Kowalewski

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Lisa Marie Ortega filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Michaela Kowalewski. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6071

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ortega, Joseph A.

Ortega, Lisa Marie

Defendants

Does 1-20

Kowalewski, Michaela

Nothing Bundt Cakes

TC2, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard F Antoine

Defendant Attorney

Peter J Hirsig

 

Court Documents

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/23/2023 01:30:00 PM

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/23/2023 01:30:00 PM

Notice - Other (of Non-Opposition and Failure to Serve Regarding Motion to Compel Further Responses from Plaintiffs) filed

Notice - Other (of Non-Opposition and Failure to Serve Regarding Motion to Compel Further Responses from Plaintiffs) filed

Notice of Disclosure

Notice of Disclosure

Declaration - Other (of Caitlyn A. Macanas iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Production of Documents, Form Interrogatories, and Special Interrogatories, Sets 1) filed

Declaration - Other (of Caitlyn A. Macanas iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Production of Documents, Form Interrogatories, and Special Interrogatories, Sets 1) filed

Statement - Other (Separate Statement iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Production of Documents, Form Interrogatories, and Special Interrogatories, Sets 1) filed

Statement - Other (Separate Statement iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Production of Documents, Form Interrogatories, and Special Interrogatories, Sets 1) filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Production of Documents, Form Interrogatories, and Special Interrogatories, Sets 1) filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Production of Documents, Form Interrogatories, and Special Interrogatories, Sets 1) filed

Motion to Compel Discovery (Further Responses to Production of Documents, Form Interrogatories, and special Interrogatories, Sets 1) filed

Motion to Compel Discovery (Further Responses to Production of Documents, Form Interrogatories, and special Interrogatories, Sets 1) filed

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 08/12/2022 08:30:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 08/12/2022 08:30:00 AM

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/12/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/12/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Mediation Statement filed

Mediation Statement filed

Joint Case Management Statement filed

Joint Case Management Statement filed

Mediation Statement filed

Mediation Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Answer submitted by Kowalewski, Michaela; TC2, Inc. rejected on 05/02/2022

Answer submitted by Kowalewski, Michaela; TC2, Inc. rejected on 05/02/2022

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/23/2023 01:30:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (of Non-Opposition and Failure to Serve Regarding Motion to Compel Further Responses from Plaintiffs) filed; Filed By: Kowalewski, Michaela(Defendant); TC2, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 03/23/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Caitlyn A. Macanas iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Production of Documents, Form Interrogatories, and Special Interrogatories, Sets 1) filed; Filed By: Kowalewski, Michaela(Defendant); TC2, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Statement - Other (Separate Statement iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Production of Documents, Form Interrogatories, and Special Interrogatories, Sets 1) filed; Filed By: Kowalewski, Michaela(Defendant); TC2, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Memorandum of Points and Authorities (iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Production of Documents, Form Interrogatories, and Special Interrogatories, Sets 1) filed; Filed By: Kowalewski, Michaela(Defendant); TC2, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion to Compel Discovery (Further Responses to Production of Documents, Form Interrogatories, and special Interrogatories, Sets 1) filed; Filed By: Kowalewski, Michaela(Defendant); TC2, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer submitted by Kowalewski, Michaela; TC2, Inc. rejected on 05/02/2022; Filed By: Kowalewski, Michaela(Defendant); TC2, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed; Filed By: Kowalewski, Michaela(Defendant); TC2, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Kowalewski, Michaela(Defendant); TC2, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Ortega, Joseph(Plaintiff); Ortega, Lisa(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Ortega, Joseph(Plaintiff); Ortega, Lisa(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Ortega, Joseph(Plaintiff); Ortega, Lisa(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less