This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 02:37:02 (UTC).

Leslie Mardock vs. Karla Lizeth Plascencia

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Leslie Mardock filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Karla Lizeth Plascencia. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1009

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mardock, Leslie

Defendants

Six Flags Discovery Kingdom

Park Management Corp

Does 1-100

Plascencia, Karla Lizeth

Six Flags Entertainment Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas P Adams

Defendant Attorney

Melanie J Krob

 

Court Documents

Stipulation (Re Proper Parties and Time to Plead) filed.

Stipulation (Re Proper Parties and Time to Plead) filed. (Filed By: Park Management Corp(Defendant))

Answer (to Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Plascencia, Karla(Defendant))

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: Plascencia, Karla(Defendant))

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/31/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/31/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/31/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketKrob, Melanie J added as a effective 08/05/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation (Re Proper Parties and Time to Plead) filed. (Filed By: Park Management Corp(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Plascencia, Karla(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: Plascencia, Karla(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/31/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Mardock, Leslie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krob, Melanie Jo