This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/08/2023 at 22:15:49 (UTC).

Laurie C Eaton vs. Isabella L Munn

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 Laurie C Eaton filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Isabella L Munn. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0957

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Eaton, Laurie C.

Respondent

Munn, Isabella L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Edwin Fong

Respondent Attorney

Rachel Renno

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2022

DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment; Department: 1; Status: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2022

DocketROA Entry: Case disposed with disposition of Denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2022

DocketROA Entry: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2022

DocketROA Entry: Minute Order 10/27/22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2022

DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketROA Entry: Trial Brief (Petitioner's Trial Brief) filed; Filed By: Eaton, Laurie(Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketROA Entry: Exhibit List filed; Filed By: Eaton, Laurie(Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketROA Entry: Witness List filed; Filed By: Eaton, Laurie(Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022

DocketROA Entry: Response filed; Filed By: Munn, Isabella(Respondent)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022

DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
07/22/2022

DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2022

DocketROA Entry: Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 08/19/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 1 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2022

DocketROA Entry: Notice of Hearing re: Civil Harassment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2022

DocketROA Entry: Minute Order 7/22/22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022

DocketROA Entry: Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed; Filed By: Eaton, Laurie(Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

DocketROA Entry: Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed; Filed By: Eaton, Laurie(Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022

DocketROA Entry: Notice of Hearing re: Civil Harassment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022

DocketROA Entry: Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 1 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022

DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Eaton, Laurie(Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2022

DocketROA Entry: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed; Filed By: Eaton, Laurie(Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less