This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/14/2023 at 01:02:10 (UTC).

Lashonta Knight vs. Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Lashonta Knight filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7805

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

and as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)

Lashonta Knight, as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)

Defendants

Does 1 - 20

Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kent L Bradbury

Defendant Attorney

Gregory L. Blueford

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Stipulated Protective Order; Confidentiality Agreement; Order Thereon) filed

Order - Other (Stipulated Protective Order; Confidentiality Agreement; Order Thereon) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Protected Order; Confidentiality Agreement) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Protected Order; Confidentiality Agreement) filed

Answer (To Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint For Damages) filed

Answer (To Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint For Damages) filed

Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) filed

Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) filed

Order - Other (Joint Stipulation and Order for Leave To File Second Amended Complaint) filed

Order - Other (Joint Stipulation and Order for Leave To File Second Amended Complaint) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (For Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (For Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint) filed

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Orders Re: Complex Case Management Procedures) filed

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Orders Re: Complex Case Management Procedures) filed

Notice - Other (Of Posting Complex Fees) filed

Notice - Other (Of Posting Complex Fees) filed

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

Amended Complaint (First) filed

Amended Complaint (First) filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 28; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Stipulated Protective Order; Confidentiality Agreement; Order Thereon) filed; Filed By: Lashonta Knight, as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff); Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Protected Order; Confidentiality Agreement) filed; Filed By: Lashonta Knight, as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff); Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Designated a complex action on 09/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Designated as an exceptional action on 09/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer (To Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint For Damages) filed; Filed By: Woodside Homes of Northern California, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) filed; Filed By: Lashonta Knight, as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Joint Stipulation and Order for Leave To File Second Amended Complaint) filed; Filed By: Lashonta Knight, as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (For Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint) filed; Filed By: Lashonta Knight, as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/09/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Amended Complaint (First) filed; Filed By: Lashonta Knight, as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed; Filed By: Lashonta Knight, as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/09/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Lashonta Knight, as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff); and as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Lashonta Knight, as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff); and as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Lashonta Knight, as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff); and as an aggrieved employee pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA)(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less