This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/27/2022 at 23:08:17 (UTC).

ZIPPOST LLC vs. GANDHI, UPENDRA K

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 ZIPPOST LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against GANDHI, UPENDRA K. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Sacramento County Carol Miller Justice Center located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1935

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZIPPOST LLC

Defendant

GANDHI, UPENDRA K

 

Court Documents

Correspondence Returned to Party

Correspondence Returned to Party

Hearing Outcome

Hearing Outcome

Proof of Service - COP

Proof of Service - COP

Request for Court Order and Answer - Filed

Request for Court Order and Answer - Filed

Attachments / Supporting Documents

Attachments / Supporting Documents

Hearing Date - Rescheduled

Hearing Date - Rescheduled

Hearing Outcome

Hearing Outcome

Notice Mailed

Notice Mailed

Venue Challenge - Filed

Venue Challenge - Filed

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $1,500 and <= $5,000

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $1,500 and <= $5,000

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Correspondence Returned to Party; For: GANDHI, UPENDRA K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Outcome

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mediation - Referred

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mediation - Agreement Not Reached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Judgment for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for Court Order and Answer - Denied After Hearing; For: GANDHI, UPENDRA K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service - COP; For: GANDHI, UPENDRA K; Service Level: Valid; Recoverable: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Attachments / Supporting Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request for Court Order and Answer - Filed; For: GANDHI, UPENDRA K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Supplemental Notice for SC Cases Set for Remote Hearings/Trial; For: ZIPPOST LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Video Conference Hearing; For: ZIPPOST LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Video Conference Hearing; For: GANDHI, UPENDRA K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Date - Rescheduled; Hearing: 1/10/2022 8:15:00 AM; Type: General Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Outcome

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Venue Found Proper

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice Mailed; For: ZIPPOST LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Venue Challenge - Filed; For: GANDHI, UPENDRA K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Video Conference Hearing; For: ZIPPOST LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Video Conference Hearing; For: GANDHI, UPENDRA K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $1,500 and <= $5,000; Hearing: 11/30/2021 8:15:00 AM; Type: Venue Challenge; Fee details; Fees Paid: $50.00; Deferred: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Recoverable: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less