This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 10/22/2020 at 13:01:29 (UTC).

Lacie Bouie vs. Gilead Sciences Inc

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Lacie Bouie filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Gilead Sciences Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5482

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnson, Oletha

Diaz, Richard

Glenn, Evat

Bouie, Lacie

Morris, Paul

Lowe, James

Darling, Keith

Pryor, Nelson

Greer, Gwendolyn

Petry, Verna

Cooper, Mary

Cardin, Michael

Taylor, Theodore

Jones, Barbara

Defendant

Gilead Sciences Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C Brooks Cutter

 

Court Documents

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Complex Case Management Procedures Including Covid-19 Protocols) filed.

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Complex Case Management Procedures Including Covid-19 Protocols) filed.

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Bouie, Lacie(Plaintiff); Cardin, Michael(Plaintiff); Cooper, Mary(Plaintiff); Darling, Keith(Plaintiff); Diaz, Richard(Plaintiff); Glenn, Evat(Plaintiff); Greer, Gwendolyn(Plaintiff); Johnson, Oletha(Plaintiff); Jones, Barbara(Plaintiff); Lowe, James(Plaintiff); Morris, Paul(Plaintiff); Petry, Verna(Plaintiff); Pryor, Nelson(Plaintiff); Taylor, Theodore(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Bouie, Lacie(Plaintiff); Cardin, Michael(Plaintiff); Cooper, Mary(Plaintiff); Darling, Keith(Plaintiff); Diaz, Richard(Plaintiff); Glenn, Evat(Plaintiff); Greer, Gwendolyn(Plaintiff); Johnson, Oletha(Plaintiff); Jones, Barbara(Plaintiff); Lowe, James(Plaintiff); Morris, Paul(Plaintiff); Petry, Verna(Plaintiff); Pryor, Nelson(Plaintiff); Taylor, Theodore(Plaintiff))

Notice of Related Case filed.

Notice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: Bouie, Lacie(Plaintiff); Cardin, Michael(Plaintiff); Cooper, Mary(Plaintiff); Darling, Keith(Plaintiff); Diaz, Richard(Plaintiff); Glenn, Evat(Plaintiff); Greer, Gwendolyn(Plaintiff); Johnson, Oletha(Plaintiff); Jones, Barbara(Plaintiff); Lowe, James(Plaintiff); Morris, Paul(Plaintiff); Petry, Verna(Plaintiff); Pryor, Nelson(Plaintiff); Taylor, Theodore(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Bouie, Lacie(Plaintiff); Cardin, Michael(Plaintiff); Cooper, Mary(Plaintiff); Darling, Keith(Plaintiff); Diaz, Richard(Plaintiff); Glenn, Evat(Plaintiff); Greer, Gwendolyn(Plaintiff); Johnson, Oletha(Plaintiff); Jones, Barbara(Plaintiff); Lowe, James(Plaintiff); Morris, Paul(Plaintiff); Petry, Verna(Plaintiff); Pryor, Nelson(Plaintiff); Taylor, Theodore(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 40; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Complex Case Management Procedures Including Covid-19 Protocols) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 40 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to 40 effective 09/30/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/25/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDesignated a complex action on 09/25/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Bouie, Lacie(Plaintiff); Cardin, Michael(Plaintiff); Cooper, Mary(Plaintiff); Darling, Keith(Plaintiff); Diaz, Richard(Plaintiff); Glenn, Evat(Plaintiff); Greer, Gwendolyn(Plaintiff); Johnson, Oletha(Plaintiff); Jones, Barbara(Plaintiff); Lowe, James(Plaintiff); Morris, Paul(Plaintiff); Petry, Verna(Plaintiff); Pryor, Nelson(Plaintiff); Taylor, Theodore(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Bouie, Lacie(Plaintiff); Cardin, Michael(Plaintiff); Cooper, Mary(Plaintiff); Darling, Keith(Plaintiff); Diaz, Richard(Plaintiff); Glenn, Evat(Plaintiff); Greer, Gwendolyn(Plaintiff); Johnson, Oletha(Plaintiff); Jones, Barbara(Plaintiff); Lowe, James(Plaintiff); Morris, Paul(Plaintiff); Petry, Verna(Plaintiff); Pryor, Nelson(Plaintiff); Taylor, Theodore(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Bouie, Lacie(Plaintiff); Cardin, Michael(Plaintiff); Cooper, Mary(Plaintiff); Darling, Keith(Plaintiff); Diaz, Richard(Plaintiff); Glenn, Evat(Plaintiff); Greer, Gwendolyn(Plaintiff); Johnson, Oletha(Plaintiff); Jones, Barbara(Plaintiff); Lowe, James(Plaintiff); Morris, Paul(Plaintiff); Petry, Verna(Plaintiff); Pryor, Nelson(Plaintiff); Taylor, Theodore(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: Bouie, Lacie(Plaintiff); Cardin, Michael(Plaintiff); Cooper, Mary(Plaintiff); Darling, Keith(Plaintiff); Diaz, Richard(Plaintiff); Glenn, Evat(Plaintiff); Greer, Gwendolyn(Plaintiff); Johnson, Oletha(Plaintiff); Jones, Barbara(Plaintiff); Lowe, James(Plaintiff); Morris, Paul(Plaintiff); Petry, Verna(Plaintiff); Pryor, Nelson(Plaintiff); Taylor, Theodore(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 47 .

    Read MoreRead Less