This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/05/2021 at 07:49:29 (UTC).

Kurt Stoer vs. The State of California

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 Kurt Stoer filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The State of California. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6300

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stoer, Kurt

Stoer, Rosie

Defendants

Reclamation District 1000

The State of California

Department of Parks and Recreation

Does 1-100

The County of Sacramento

The City of Sacramento

Martin Brothers Construction Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Maurice Fitzgerald

Defendant Attorney

Susana Alcala Wood

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal - Cause(s) of Action filed.

Request for Dismissal - Cause(s) of Action filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Reclamation District 1000(Defendant); The City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Cartwright) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Cartwright) filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

Notice - Other (of Motion for Order) filed.

Notice - Other (of Motion for Order) filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

Motion - Other (for Order Relieving from Provisions) filed.

Motion - Other (for Order Relieving from Provisions) filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

Opposition (to Plntf's Application for Relief) filed.

Opposition (to Plntf's Application for Relief) filed. (Filed By: The City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Reclamation District 1000(Defendant); The City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (for ORder for Relief) filed.

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (for ORder for Relief) filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Brian Lance ISO Motion for Order for Relief From Claims Statute) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Brian Lance ISO Motion for Order for Relief From Claims Statute) filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

Objection filed.

Objection filed. (Filed By: The City of Sacramento(Defendant))

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMartin Brothers Construction Inc added as a Defendant effective 12/04/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 51) filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Petition - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/04/2020 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPetition - Other - Civil Law and Motion rescheduled to 11/04/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPetition - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 11/04/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketcontinued to at in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/06/2020 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection filed. (Filed By: The City of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/27/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/27/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Stoer, Kurt(Plaintiff); Stoer, Rosie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF PARKS AND RECREATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MARTIN BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where City of Sacramento is a litigant

Latest cases where Reclamation District No 3 is a litigant