This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/13/2021 at 16:41:23 (UTC).

Krystal Camina vs. Wok in the Park LLC

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Krystal Camina filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Wok in the Park LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9018

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Camina, Krystal

and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act

Defendants

Cafeteria 15L

Wok in the Park LLC

Does 1 through 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwin Aiwazian

Defendant Attorney

Alden J. Parker

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Delay In Schedculing Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay In Schedculing Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Camina, Krystal(Plaintiff); and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Camina, Krystal(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Camina, Krystal(Plaintiff))

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: Cafeteria 15L(Defendant); Wok in the Park LLC(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO defs Demurrer) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO defs Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Cafeteria 15L(Defendant); Wok in the Park LLC(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice (ISO defs Demurrer) filed.

Request - Judicial Notice (ISO defs Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Cafeteria 15L(Defendant); Wok in the Park LLC(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Gregory L Blueford ISO defs Demurrer) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Gregory L Blueford ISO defs Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Cafeteria 15L(Defendant); Wok in the Park LLC(Defendant))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Camina, Krystal(Plaintiff); and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Camina, Krystal(Plaintiff); and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Camina, Krystal(Plaintiff); and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 06/02/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer filed. (Filed By: Cafeteria 15L(Defendant); Wok in the Park LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO defs Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Cafeteria 15L(Defendant); Wok in the Park LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Judicial Notice (ISO defs Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Cafeteria 15L(Defendant); Wok in the Park LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Gregory L Blueford ISO defs Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Cafeteria 15L(Defendant); Wok in the Park LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Camina, Krystal(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Camina, Krystal(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Camina, Krystal(Plaintiff); and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Camina, Krystal(Plaintiff); and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Camina, Krystal(Plaintiff); and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay In Schedculing Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Camina, Krystal(Plaintiff); and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN