This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 13:31:32 (UTC).

KHM Holdings LLC vs. William Beahm and Greer Beahm as Trustees of theTHe Beahm Family Living Trust

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 KHM Holdings LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against William Beahm and Greer Beahm as Trustees of theTHe Beahm Family Living Trust. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1335

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHM Holdings LLC

Defendants

Does 1-25

William Beahm and Greer Beahm as Trustees of theTHe Beahm Family Living Trust

Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust

William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust

Cross Defendants

Frazier, Ben

Kidder Matthews of California Inc

Purewal, Manroop

Roes 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason L Hoffman

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Greer Beahm as trustee of the Breahm Family Trust) filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Greer Beahm as trustee of the Breahm Family Trust) filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Defendant); William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant); William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant))

Summons (on Cross-Complaint) filed.

Summons (on Cross-Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant); William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant))

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel filed.

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant); William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant))

Declaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment filed.

Declaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant); William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant); William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant))

Answer (to Cross-Complaint of William Beahm) filed.

Answer (to Cross-Complaint of William Beahm) filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Cross - Defendant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Cross - Defendant))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Defendant))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Defendant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

Notice of Pendency of Action filed.

Notice of Pendency of Action filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/29/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/29/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (to Cross-Complaint of William Beahm) filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/27/2019 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant); William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant); William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant); William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability of Counsel filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant); William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons (on Cross-Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Greer Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant); William Beahm as Trustee of the Beahm Family Living Trust(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Pendency of Action filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/29/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Case assigned to Department 23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/27/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: KHM Holdings LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kidder Mathews of California Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOFFMAN, JASON L.