This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/15/2022 at 14:50:21 (UTC).

KESSLER, DARRYL RAYMOND vs. HOTWIRE INC., AN EXPEDIA GROUP COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 KESSLER, DARRYL RAYMOND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOTWIRE INC , AN EXPEDIA GROUP COMPANY. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Carol Miller Justice Center located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1071

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KESSLER, DARRYL RAYMOND

Defendant

HOTWIRE INC., AN EXPEDIA GROUP COMPANY

Not Yet Classified

NATIONAL REGISTERED AGENTS, INC.

 

Court Documents

Hearing Outcome

Hearing Outcome

Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party

Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party

Notice of Video Conference Hearing

Notice of Video Conference Hearing

Proof of Service - COP

Proof of Service - COP

Certified Mail Fee

Certified Mail Fee

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant <= $1,500

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant <= $1,500

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Outcome

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dropped from Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party; For: HOTWIRE INC., AN EXPEDIA GROUP COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Video Conference Hearing; For: KESSLER, DARRYL RAYMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Video Conference Hearing; For: HOTWIRE INC., AN EXPEDIA GROUP COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service - COP; For: HOTWIRE INC., AN EXPEDIA GROUP COMPANY; Service Level: Valid; Recoverable: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant <= $1,500; Hearing: 8/18/2021 1:30:00 PM; Type: General Case; Fee details; Fees Paid: $30.00; Deferred: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Recoverable: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certified Mail Fee; For: HOTWIRE INC., AN EXPEDIA GROUP COMPANY; Fee details; Fees Paid: $15.00; Deferred: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Recoverable: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hotwire, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL REGISTERED AGENTS is a litigant