This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/25/2021 at 13:31:55 (UTC).

Kenneth Akins vs. Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 Kenneth Akins filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0718

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Akins, Bonnie

Akins, Kenneth

Defendants

Does 1-10

Federal National Mortgage Association

Nationstar Mortgage LLC

The Mortgage Law Firm PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony Paul Cara

Defendant Attorney

Jared D Bissell

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Akins, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Akins, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Akins, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Akins, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Akins, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Akins, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Akins, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Akins, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Answer (to Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Nationstar Mortgage LLC(Defendant))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketBissell, Jared D added as a effective 12/15/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Nationstar Mortgage LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Akins, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Akins, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Akins, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Akins, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Akins, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Akins, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Akins, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Akins, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MORTGAGE LAW FIRM PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BISSELL JARED D.