This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/12/2019 at 13:01:18 (UTC).

Keith Owen vs. Barbara Rudometkin

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Keith Owen filed an Other lawsuit against Barbara Rudometkin. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9142

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Owen, Keith

Defendants

Rudometkin, Barbara

Does 1-20

Ellie, Lorraine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elaine Videa

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/21/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/21/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketOwen, Keith Application for Waiver granted in full on 11/21/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/21/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fee (FW-001) filed. (Filed By: Owen, Keith(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Owen, Keith(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less