This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 03:18:05 (UTC).

Kehlani Wong vs. Monte Bello Apartments, LLC, a limited liability company

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 Kehlani Wong filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Monte Bello Apartments, LLC, a limited liability company. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1837

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wong, Kehlani

Defendants

Does 1-50

Monte Bello Apartments, LLC, a limited liability company

Guardian Ad Litem

Prater, Davante

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel William Dunbar

Defendant Attorney

James R Donahue

 

Court Documents

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer (To Complaint) filed

Answer (To Complaint) filed

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Notice of Entry of Order filed

Notice of Entry of Order filed

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed; Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Change of Firm Name filed; Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Entry of Order filed; Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/01/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed; Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Prater, Davante added as a Guardian Ad Litem effective 01/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer (To Complaint) filed; Filed By: Monte Bello Apartments, LLC, a limited liability company(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: This case is reassigned from department 43 to department 38 for Case Management Program

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed; Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Wong, Kehlani(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNBAR DANIEL