This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/19/2022 at 20:17:14 (UTC).

Katie Shavers vs. Winco Foods, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Katie Shavers filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Winco Foods, LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2870

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shavers, Katie

Defendants

Does 1-100

Winco Foods, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan S Turlington

Defendant Attorney

Kelly Snowden

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Shavers, Katie(Plaintiff))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Shavers, Katie(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Shavers, Katie(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Shavers, Katie(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Shavers, Katie(Plaintiff))

Answer filed

Answer filed

Demand for Jury Trial filed

Demand for Jury Trial filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Demand for Jury Trial filed; Filed By: Winco Foods, LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Winco Foods, LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Shavers, Katie(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Shavers, Katie(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Shavers, Katie Application for Waiver granted in full on 12/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed; Filed By: Shavers, Katie(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Shavers, Katie(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Shavers, Katie(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINCO FOODS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Snowden, Kelly J.