This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 19:31:46 (UTC).

Kassandra Herndon vs. Agreeya Solutions Inc, a California corporation

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 Kassandra Herndon filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Agreeya Solutions Inc, a California corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4963

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated

Herndon, Kassandra

Defendants

Agreeya Solutions Inc, a California corporation

Does 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan M. Genish

Defendant Attorneys

Adrian M Hoppes

Laura C McHugh

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Notice of Case Mngmt. Conference and Orders Re: Complex Case Mngmt. Procedures

Notice of Case Mngmt. Conference and Orders Re: Complex Case Mngmt. Procedures

Notice - Other (Of Case Management Conference And Orders) filed

Notice - Other (Of Case Management Conference And Orders) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 25; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (Of Case Management Conference And Orders) filed; Filed By: Herndon, Kassandra(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 05/11/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 25 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Case Mngmt. Conference and Orders Re: Complex Case Mngmt. Procedures

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: McHugh, Laura C added as a effective 09/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Hoppes, Adrian M added as a effective 09/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Agreeya Solutions Inc, a California corporation(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Herndon, Kassandra(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case reassigned to 25 effective 08/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Herndon, Kassandra(Plaintiff); and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Designated a complex action on 08/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Herndon, Kassandra(Plaintiff); and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Herndon, Kassandra(Plaintiff); and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENISH JONATHAN MEIR