This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/19/2022 at 15:02:53 (UTC).

Juana Madrigal vs. Aerotek, Inc. a Maryland corporation

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 Juana Madrigal filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Aerotek, Inc a Maryland corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1963

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Madrigal, Juana

on behalf of other individuals similarly situated

Defendants

Aerotek, Inc. a Maryland corporation

Does 1-10

Health Net Of California, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcus J Bradley

Defendant Attorneys

Michael S Kun

Victoria A Kovanis

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Madrigal, Juana(Plaintiff); on behalf of other individuals similarly situated(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Order Re: Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Order Re: Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Madrigal, Juana(Plaintiff); on behalf of other individuals similarly situated(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Madrigal, Juana(Plaintiff); on behalf of other individuals similarly situated(Plaintiff))

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Madrigal, Juana(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Madrigal, Juana(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management and Complex Case Management Procedures) filed.

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management and Complex Case Management Procedures) filed.

Answer (to Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Aerotek, Inc. a Maryland corporation(Defendant))

Answer (to Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Health Net Of California, Inc.(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for heard on 01/25/2022 02:45:00 PM

Minutes finalized for heard on 01/25/2022 02:45:00 PM

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Proof of Service filed

Proof of Service filed

Proof of Service (By Electronic Service) filed

Proof of Service (By Electronic Service) filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 28; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service (By Electronic Service) filed; Filed By: Madrigal, Juana(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for heard on 01/25/2022 02:45:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: The Case Management Conference - Complex set for 08/12/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 37 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: The Case Management Conference - Complex is scheduled for 08/12/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: This case is reassigned to department 28 for complex case management

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 08/12/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in Department 37 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 08/12/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in Department 28 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service filed; Filed By: Madrigal, Juana(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Madrigal, Juana(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case reassigned to 37 effective 12/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Madrigal, Juana(Plaintiff); on behalf of other individuals similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Designated a complex action on 12/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Order Re: Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Madrigal, Juana(Plaintiff); on behalf of other individuals similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Madrigal, Juana(Plaintiff); on behalf of other individuals similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEROTEK INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY MARCUS J.