This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 23:13:01 (UTC).

JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A. vs. William E. Craig

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against William E Craig. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7921

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.

Defendants

Does 1-50

Craig, William E.

Craig, Sharon A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Razi-Jafari

 

Court Documents

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Request - Court Judgment filed.

Request - Court Judgment filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Notice - Other (of Application and Application for Default Court Judgment) filed.

Notice - Other (of Application and Application for Default Court Judgment) filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Default Court Judgment) filed.

Declaration - Other (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Default Court Judgment) filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Charles A. Correia in Support of Request for Default Court Judgment) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Charles A. Correia in Support of Request for Default Court Judgment) filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (in Support of Default Judgment) filed.

Declaration - Other (in Support of Default Judgment) filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Non-Military Status) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Non-Military Status) filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Request for Waiver of Live Testimony) filed.

Declaration - Other (Request for Waiver of Live Testimony) filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Default Court Judgment) filed.

Declaration - Other (Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Default Court Judgment) filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Judgment - by Court - Default filed.

Judgment - by Court - Default filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Charles A Correia ISO Filing of Proposed Amended Default Court Judgment) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Charles A Correia ISO Filing of Proposed Amended Default Court Judgment) filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Proposed Order (Amended Default Court Judgment) filed.

Proposed Order (Amended Default Court Judgment) filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Judgment - by Court - Default filed.

Judgment - by Court - Default filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment - by Court - Default filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Charles A Correia ISO Filing of Proposed Amended Default Court Judgment) filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (Amended Default Court Judgment) filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment - by Court - Default filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Court Judgment filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Craig, Sharon A. on Complaint .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/08/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/05/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: JPMorgan Chasw Bank, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAZI-JAFARI JEFFREY