This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/09/2023 at 12:34:14 (UTC).

Joseph Skates vs. Bottling Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 Joseph Skates filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Bottling Group, LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8959

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

on behalf of all other similarly situated

Skates, Joseph

Sisneros, Joseph

Defendants

Bottling Group, LLC

CB Manufacturing Company, Inc.

Does 1-20

Interested Party

Magdaleno Nuno, individually, and on behalf of others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kent L Bradbury

Defendant Attorney

James H Berry, Jr

Interested Party Attorney

Matthew J Matern

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case filed

Notice of Related Case filed

Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed

Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (To Continue Case Management Conference) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (To Continue Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Joint Stipulation to Continue CMC; Order) filed

Order - Other (Joint Stipulation to Continue CMC; Order) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order) filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Notice - Other (Of Magdaleno Nuno's Re: Filing of Response in Opposition to Defendants Notice of related Case) filed

Notice - Other (Of Magdaleno Nuno's Re: Filing of Response in Opposition to Defendants Notice of related Case) filed

Order - Other (Joint Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Bottling Group, LLC and CB Manufacturing Company, Inc., May Respond to Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint for Damages; Order) filed

Order - Other (Joint Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Bottling Group, LLC and CB Manufacturing Company, Inc., May Respond to Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint for Damages; Order) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Joint Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants May Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint for Damages) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Joint Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants May Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint for Damages) filed

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Orders RE: Complex Case Management Procedures) filed

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Orders RE: Complex Case Management Procedures) filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 28; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (To Continue Case Management Conference) filed; Filed By: Bottling Group, LLC(Defendant); CB Manufacturing Company, Inc.(Defendant); Sisneros, Joseph(Plaintiff); Skates, Joseph(Plaintiff); on behalf of all other similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Joint Stipulation to Continue CMC; Order) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 03/23/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 28 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Complex rescheduled to 03/23/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 28 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order) filed; Filed By: Skates, Joseph(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Bottling Group, LLC(Defendant); CB Manufacturing Company, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Related Case filed; Filed By: Bottling Group, LLC(Defendant); CB Manufacturing Company, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Magdaleno Nuno, individually, and on behalf of others similarly situated added as a Interested Party effective 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (Of Magdaleno Nuno's Re: Filing of Response in Opposition to Defendants Notice of related Case) filed; Filed By: Magdaleno Nuno, individually, and on behalf of others similarly situated(Interested Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Skates, Joseph(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Skates, Joseph(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Skates, Joseph(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case reassigned to 28 effective 04/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Designated a complex action on 04/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Skates, Joseph(Plaintiff); on behalf of all other similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Skates, Joseph(Plaintiff); on behalf of all other similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Skates, Joseph(Plaintiff); on behalf of all other similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less