This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/17/2022 at 20:40:04 (UTC).

JOHNSON, DAVON JAMES et al. vs. MALAK MOTORS

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 JOHNSON, DAVON JAMES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MALAK MOTORS. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Carol Miller Justice Center located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0089

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNSON, DAVON JAMES

SCOTT, BRITTANY MARIE

Defendant

MALAK MOTORS

Not Yet Classified

GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $1,500 and <= $5,000

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $1,500 and <= $5,000

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of In-person and Remote Hearing; For: JOHNSON, DAVON JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of In-person and Remote Hearing; For: SCOTT, BRITTANY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of In-person and Remote Hearing; For: MALAK MOTORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $1,500 and <= $5,000; Hearing: 3/22/2022 1:30:00 PM; Type: Large $ Case; Fee details; Fees Paid: $50.00; Deferred: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Recoverable: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Law Offices of George A Gallegos is a litigant