This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/15/2022 at 12:17:32 (UTC).

John Nguyen vs. Jason Peneyra

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 John Nguyen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jason Peneyra. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8362

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nguyen, John

Defendants

Giles, Andre

Does 1-50

Peneyra, Jason

Canus Corporation

Cross Defendant

Roes 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anh Phoong

Ognian Gavrilov

Richard E McGreevy

Defendant Attorneys

Barbara L Miller

Ivan L. Iles

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/04/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/04/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Reply to Opposition (of Defendants Andre Giles and Canus Corporation to Peneyra's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement) filed

Reply to Opposition (of Defendants Andre Giles and Canus Corporation to Peneyra's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement) filed

Reply to Opposition (of Plaintiff John Nguyen to Peneyra's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement) filed

Reply to Opposition (of Plaintiff John Nguyen to Peneyra's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement) filed

Opposition (to Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement) filed

Opposition (to Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement) filed

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 03/04/2022 08:30:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 03/04/2022 08:30:00 AM

Opposition (to Motion to Enforce Settlement) filed

Opposition (to Motion to Enforce Settlement) filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Motion - Other (to Enforce Settlement) filed

Motion - Other (to Enforce Settlement) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Minutes finalized for heard on 01/13/2022 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for heard on 01/13/2022 09:00:00 AM

Association of Attorney filed

Association of Attorney filed

Answer (Cross-Complaint) filed

Answer (Cross-Complaint) filed

Answer (Cross-Complaint) filed

Answer (Cross-Complaint) filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Answer (To Complaint) filed

Answer (To Complaint) filed

Cross-Complaint filed

Cross-Complaint filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Enforce Settlement - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Reply to Opposition (of Defendants Andre Giles and Canus Corporation to Peneyra's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement) filed; Filed By: Peneyra, Jason(Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Reply to Opposition (of Plaintiff John Nguyen to Peneyra's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement) filed; Filed By: Peneyra, Jason(Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Opposition (to Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement) filed; Filed By: Canus Corporation(Defendant); Giles, Andre(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 03/04/2022 08:30:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Opposition (to Motion to Enforce Settlement) filed; Filed By: Nguyen, John(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/04/2022 08:30:00 AM published

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer (To Complaint) filed; Filed By: Canus Corporation(Defendant); Giles, Andre(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Cross-Complaint filed; Filed By: Canus Corporation(Cross - Complainant); Giles, Andre(Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Nguyen, John(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed; Filed By: Nguyen, John(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 04/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Nguyen, John(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Nguyen, John(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Nguyen, John(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less