Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 14:25:26 (UTC).

Joan Cameron vs. Regents of University of California Davis

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Joan Cameron filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Regents of University of California Davis. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1768

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cameron, Joan

Defendants

Does 1-20

Regents of University of California Davis

Regents of University of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edgar Manukyan

Defendant Attorney

Timothy G Yeung

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Demurrer or Moving Party ISO Automatic Extension) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Demurrer or Moving Party ISO Automatic Extension) filed. (Filed By: Regents of University of California(Defendant))

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Cameron, Joan(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Cameron, Joan(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Cameron, Joan(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Cameron, Joan(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Cameron, Joan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Demurrer or Moving Party ISO Automatic Extension) filed. (Filed By: Regents of University of California(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/15/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Cameron, Joan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Cameron, Joan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Cameron, Joan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy G. Yeung