This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/07/2023 at 22:14:38 (UTC).

Jennett Dinkins vs. Brandon Hill

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 Jennett Dinkins filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Brandon Hill. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8509

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dinkins, Jennett

Defendants

Does 1-50

Hill, Brandon

Hill, Tara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vanessa Marie Romero

Defendant Attorney

G Rich Gillespie

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Order - Other (Order Re: Delay in scheduling initial case management conference) filed

Order - Other (Order Re: Delay in scheduling initial case management conference) filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/30/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/30/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 09/30/2022 08:30:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 09/30/2022 08:30:00 AM

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Gillespie, G Rich added as a effective 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Hill, Brandon(Defendant); Hill, Tara(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Dinkins, Jennett(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Dinkins, Jennett(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 09/30/2022 08:30:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program continued to 07/21/2023 at 08:30 in this department

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program rescheduled to 07/21/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/30/2022 08:30:00 AM published

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Dinkins, Jennett(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Order Re: Delay in scheduling initial case management conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Dinkins, Jennett(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Dinkins, Jennett(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less