This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 06:48:06 (UTC).

Jeld-Wen, Inc. vs. Katelyn Corpe

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 Jeld-Wen, Inc filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Katelyn Corpe. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2048

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

Jeld-Wen, Inc.

Respondent

Corpe, Katelyn

Interested Party

Labor Commissioner, State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Richard N Sieving

 

Court Documents

Released Undertaking on Appeal Bond#800116889 in amount of 14830.60 to JELD-WEN, Inc. per order signed by Raymond M. Cadei on04/09/21

Released Undertaking on Appeal Bond#800116889 in amount of 14830.60 to JELD-WEN, Inc. per order signed by Raymond M. Cadei on04/09/21

Order - Other filed

Order - Other filed

Proof of Service filed

Proof of Service filed

Application - Other (for Order to Release and Return Undertaking to Appellant and for Dismissal of Action) filed

Application - Other (for Order to Release and Return Undertaking to Appellant and for Dismissal of Action) filed

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/25/2021 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/25/2021 09:00:00 AM

Notice - Other (Notice of withdrwal of motion to compel) filed

Notice - Other (Notice of withdrwal of motion to compel) filed

Notice of Settlement filed

Notice of Settlement filed

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/04/2021 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/04/2021 09:00:00 AM

Reply to Opposition filed

Reply to Opposition filed

Opposition (to MTC) filed

Opposition (to MTC) filed

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed

Proof of Service filed

Proof of Service filed

Notice of Motion (amended Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings) filed

Notice of Motion (amended Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings) filed

Declaration - Other (of Richard N Sieving ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed

Declaration - Other (of Richard N Sieving ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed

Declaration - Other (of Doug Shorey ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed

Declaration - Other (of Doug Shorey ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed

Motion - Other (to Compel Arbitration) filed

Motion - Other (to Compel Arbitration) filed

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Released Undertaking on Appeal Bond#800116889 in amount of 14830.60 to JELD-WEN, Inc. per order signed by Raymond M. Cadei on04/09/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Appeal on the Award of Labor Comm disposed with disposition of Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc.(Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Application - Other (for Order to Release and Return Undertaking to Appellant and for Dismissal of Action) filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc.(Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/25/2021 09:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (Notice of withdrwal of motion to compel) filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc.(Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc.(Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc.(Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Hearing - Short Cause Civil Trial Assignment filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Trial Assignment - Labor Commission Appeal - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service - MAILING filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc.(Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (of Filing Undertaking on Appeal) filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc.(Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Undertaking filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc.(Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc.(Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Appeal on the Award of Labor Comm filed; Filed By: Jeld-Wen, Inc.(Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JELD-WEN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sieving, Richard Norman