This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 14:20:30 (UTC).

Jeanne Brazzil vs. The Parent Cooperative

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 Jeanne Brazzil filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Parent Cooperative. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6422

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brazzil, Jeanne

Brazzil, Tim

Defendants

The Parent Cooperative

Does 1-50

Derose, Carla

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brad A Schultz

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan L Malone

Shawn C Loorz

 

Court Documents

Answer (To Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Derose, Carla(Defendant); The Parent Cooperative(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Demurring Party ISO Automatic Extenson) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Demurring Party ISO Automatic Extenson) filed. (Filed By: Derose, Carla(Defendant); The Parent Cooperative(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Brazzil, Jeanne(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Brazzil, Jeanne(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Brazzil, Jeanne(Plaintiff); Brazzil, Tim(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Brazzil, Jeanne(Plaintiff); Brazzil, Tim(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Brazzil, Jeanne(Plaintiff); Brazzil, Tim(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/13/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/13/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Derose, Carla(Defendant); The Parent Cooperative(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Derose, Carla(Defendant); The Parent Cooperative(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Demurring Party ISO Automatic Extenson) filed. (Filed By: Derose, Carla(Defendant); The Parent Cooperative(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Brazzil, Jeanne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Brazzil, Jeanne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/13/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/14/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Brazzil, Jeanne(Plaintiff); Brazzil, Tim(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Brazzil, Jeanne(Plaintiff); Brazzil, Tim(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Brazzil, Jeanne(Plaintiff); Brazzil, Tim(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schultz, Brad A