This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 14:02:27 (UTC).

Jamie Russell vs. Adesa California LLC

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 Jamie Russell filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Adesa California LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3097

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Russell, Jamie

Defendants

Hinkle, Christina

Adesa California LLC

Does 1-50

Kar Auction Services

Hannah, Kim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew L Mann

Defendant Attorney

Simerdip Khangura

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Russell, Jamie(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/11/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/11/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Russell, Jamie(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Russell, Jamie(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Russell, Jamie(Plaintiff))

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed. (Filed By: Russell, Jamie(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Of Simerdip Khangura Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure Section 430.41) filed.

Declaration - Other (Of Simerdip Khangura Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure Section 430.41) filed. (Filed By: Adesa California LLC(Defendant); Hannah, Kim(Defendant))

Answer (To Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Adesa California LLC(Defendant))

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Russell, Jamie(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/11/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement filed. (Filed By: Russell, Jamie(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Of Simerdip Khangura Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure Section 430.41) filed. (Filed By: Adesa California LLC(Defendant); Hannah, Kim(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Adesa California LLC(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/11/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Russell, Jamie(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Russell, Jamie(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Russell, Jamie(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAR Auction Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Adesa California LLC, a California limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANN MATTHEW L