This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 05:23:56 (UTC).

James Edwards vs. Estiframe Technologies, INC

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 James Edwards filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Estiframe Technologies, INC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6399

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edwards, James

Defendants

Does 1-20

Estiframe Technologies, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy B Del Castillo

Defendant Attorney

Roger Mansukhani

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Estiframe Technologies, INC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Edwards, James(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Edwards, James(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Edwards, James(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Edwards, James(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANSUKHANI ROGER MOHAN