This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 02:35:44 (UTC).

Jacob Nicholas Rodriguez vs. California Department Of Health Care Services

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 Jacob Nicholas Rodriguez filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against California Department Of Health Care Services. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3973

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rodriguez, Jacob Nicholas

Respondents

California Department Of Health Care Services

Michelle Baass, in her official capacity as Director of the California Department of Health Care Services

 

Court Documents

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed

Case initiation form printed

Case initiation form printed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Request for Dismissal (Request for Dismissal) filed

Request for Dismissal (Request for Dismissal) filed

Notice of Dismissal generated

Notice of Dismissal generated

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed; Filed By: Rodriguez, Jacob(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Dismissal generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Writ of Mandate disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal (Request for Dismissal) filed; Filed By: Rodriguez, Jacob(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Rodriguez, Jacob Nicholas Application for Waiver granted in full on 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Rodriguez, Jacob(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case initiation form printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed; Filed By: Rodriguez, Jacob(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Rodriguez, Jacob(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Writ of Mandate filed; Filed By: Rodriguez, Jacob(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Department of Health Care Services is a litigant