This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 13:05:58 (UTC).

Irina Harbaruk vs. City Of Sacramento

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 Irina Harbaruk filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against City Of Sacramento. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3906

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Harbaruk, Irina

Respondent

City Of Sacramento

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Andrea M Velasque

 

Court Documents

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Denied Additional Court Fees) filed

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Denied Additional Court Fees) filed

Case initiation form printed

Case initiation form printed

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Related Case filed; Filed By: City Of Sacramento(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Velasque, Andrea M added as a effective 07/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Harbaruk, Irina Application for Waiver granted in part on 07/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Harbaruk, Irina Application for Waiver granted in part on 07/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Harbaruk, Irina Application for Waiver denied in whole on 07/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Denied Additional Court Fees) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Harbaruk, Irina Application for Waiver granted in full on 06/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case initiation form printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed; Filed By: Harbaruk, Irina(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Writ of Mandate filed; Filed By: Harbaruk, Irina(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Sacramento is a litigant